This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 14:57:00 (UTC).

DUARDO, SAUL RICHARD - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/26/2014 DUARDO, SAUL RICHARD - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OROZCO, YOLANDA, MURPHY, DANIEL S., CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S., LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A., HOUSE, MARY THORNTON and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7951

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OROZCO, YOLANDA

MURPHY, DANIEL S.

CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S.

LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A.

HOUSE, MARY THORNTON

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUARDO LISA

Claimants

LOS ANGELES ROCK AND GRAVEL LLC

STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

MAGDALENA BELTRAN-DEL OLMO

Respondent

KOLICH-LASKEY DANIELLE

Decedent

DUARDO SAUL RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KANIN MATTHEW D. ESQ

BYRNE JOHN M. ESQ

BIRKEL JULIA L. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate - OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

11/26/2014: Petition for Probate - OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984) - EX PARTE

12/10/2014: Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984) - EX PARTE

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

1/12/2015: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Letters Testamentary

1/13/2015: Letters Testamentary

Judgment by Court-Petition Denied Supervisory Order PETITION TO ESTABLISH ESTATE'S CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP TO PROPERTY;... 1st Hearing Date: 09/10/2015 Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres

6/2/2015: Judgment by Court-Petition Denied Supervisory Order PETITION TO ESTABLISH ESTATE'S CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP TO PROPERTY;... 1st Hearing Date: 09/10/2015 Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres

Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING

6/8/2015: Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING

OTHER - POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESION AGAINST DANIELLE LASKEY

6/8/2015: OTHER - POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESION AGAINST DANIELLE LASKEY

OTHER - DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

7/8/2015: OTHER - DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Ruling - ON PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST DANIELLE LASKEY

7/15/2015: Notice of Ruling - ON PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST DANIELLE LASKEY

Proof of Holographic Instrument - AMENDED

11/13/2015: Proof of Holographic Instrument - AMENDED

Minute Order

11/19/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/10/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/1/2018: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- FINAL

9/26/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- FINAL

Notice - Hearing

10/4/2018: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

1/2/2020: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/30/2020: Minute Order

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • Hearing01/29/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEstate Administration Extended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors (Notice - Administration to Creditors ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketDeclaration (of urgency Filed By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Cunningham, David S., Presiding; Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketProof of Publication (Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (DWOP at request of atty Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 01/06/2015 Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Filed By: Duardo, Lisa, Petitioner Repres By: Byrne, John M., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRKEL JULIA LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANIN MATTHEW DAVID