This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2023 at 07:11:32 (UTC).

DORIS CHARLES ET AL VS THE WINE GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2015 DORIS CHARLES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against THE WINE GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6061

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES DORIS

JONES ALVIN

PELTIER JASON

PELTIER JENNIFER

Defendants and Respondents

SUTTER HOME WINERY INC.

WINE GROUP INC. THE

WINE GROUP LLC THE

CONSTELLATION WINES US

REBEL WINE CO. LLC

GP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WOODBRIDGE WINERY INC.

BRONCO WINE COMPANY

HAHN FAMILY WINES

SMITH & HOOK WINERY CORPORATION

OAKVILLE WINERY MANAGEMENT CORP.

TREASURY WINES ESTATES AMERICAS CO.

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

RAYMOND VINEYARD AND CELLAR/RAYMOND

JEAN-CLAUDE BOISSET WINES USA INC.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURG SIMPSON ELDREDGE HERSH & JARDINE PC

KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP

RAFFERTY LEVIN PAPANTONIO THOMAS MICHELL

Defendant Attorneys

DAY JONES

LARSON O'BRIEN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

8/24/2016: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2018

DocketDocument:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2016

DocketDocument:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2016

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2016

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

DocketDocument:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2016

DocketDocument:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2016

DocketDocument:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2016

DocketDocument:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2016

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2016

DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 379 Days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
04/21/2015

DocketProceeding/Event:Order Re: Reassignment of Case Emilie H. Elias

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2015

DocketMinute order entered: 2015-04-21 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2015

DocketProceeding/Event:Affidavit of Prejudice William F. Highberger 1:30 pm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2015

DocketMinute order entered: 2015-04-16 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketDocument:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Prdct Liablty(not asbes,tox,envir)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less