This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:48:50 (UTC).

DONALD ZUK VS DAVID S CANNOM M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 DONALD ZUK filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DAVID S CANNOM M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2594

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZUK DONALD

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

DAVID S. CANNOM M.D. INC.

CANNOM DAVID S. M.D.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT VAAGE

Defendant Attorney

HULBERT GREGORY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D., DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D., INC. AND LOS ANGELES CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

9/7/2016: DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D., DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D., INC. AND LOS ANGELES CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

Minute Order

11/20/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/5/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/30/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/6/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOR SPECIFICATION OF DAMAGES

9/7/2016: DEMAND FOR SPECIFICATION OF DAMAGES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/4/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/7/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

9/7/2016: Unknown

SUMMONS

6/6/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/5/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D.'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/7/2016: DEFENDANT DAVID S. CANNOM, M.D.'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/5/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/6/2016: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS

9/7/2016: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

6/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by David S. M.D. Cannom (Defendant); David S. Cannom, M.D., Inc. (Defendant); Los Angeles Cardiology Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Donald Zuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less