This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 13:20:02 (UTC).

DONALD R. INGALLS, ET AL VS. SUSAN JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 11/30/2009 DONALD R INGALLS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUSAN JOHNSTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6549

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COHEN JEFFREY S.

INGALLS DONALD R.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

JOHNSTON SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

INGALLS DONALD R. ESQ.

COHEN JEFFREY S. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Action W/Prej. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less