This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 13:34:40 (UTC).

DONALD BOEHNER VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2013 DONALD BOEHNER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0442

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOEHNER DONALD

Defendants and Respondents

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALFA LAVAL INC.

AMERICAN BLOWER COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INCORPORATED

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BELL & GOSSETT KENNEDY VALVE MANUFACTURI

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

BRYANT HEATING & COLLING SYSTEMES

BW/IP INC

CANADIAN PACIFIC RAILWAY CO

CARRIER CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION F/K/A

CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHICAGO MILWAUKEE ST. PAUL

CHICAGO MILWAUKEE ST. PAUL AND

CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

SELMAN & BREITMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

1/27/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/22/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

2/5/2013: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS -

2/5/2013: SUMMONS -

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donald Boehner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYANT HEATING & COOLING SYSTEMS (DIS) is a litigant

Latest cases where BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN STANDARD INC. is a litigant