This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 21:51:28 (UTC).

DOLORES VILLANUEVA ET AL VS DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER E

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 DOLORES VILLANUEVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and RAUL A. SAHAGUN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0713

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HIE MARY

MARTINEZ MARTHA

VILLANUEVA DOLORES

VILLANUEVA GLORIA

VILLANUEVA ROBERTO

VILLANUEVA DOLORES BY AND THROUGH HIS

RAMIREZ MARTHA

Defendants and Respondents

DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL

KINDRED HOSPITAL LA MIRADA

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC.

DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL

RIOS EMMA

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

RIOS EMMA - A NOMINAL DEFENDANT ONLY

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-DOWNEY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPEFCIALTY CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FRASER WATSON & CROUTCH LLP

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING

9/10/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH. HOSPITAL-DOWNEY AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/29/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH. HOSPITAL-DOWNEY AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/28/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/28/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

5/27/2015: MOTION / OPPOSITION / STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - HOSPITAL, INC. DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

5/19/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - HOSPITAL, INC. DBA PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL LA MIRADA

5/19/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL LA MIRADA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.

5/19/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON NOMINAL DEFENDANT EMMA RIOS

5/15/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON NOMINAL DEFENDANT EMMA RIOS

SUMMONS -

5/1/2015: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT; ETC

5/1/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT; ETC

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/1/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DECLARATION OF GLORIA VILLANUEVA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32 AND WELFARE & INSTITUTIONS CODE SECTION 15657.3

5/1/2015: DECLARATION OF GLORIA VILLANUEVA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32 AND WELFARE & INSTITUTIONS CODE SECTION 15657.3

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); GLORIA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff); MARY HIE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); GLORIA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff); MARY HIE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, INC. DBA PIH HEALTH HOSP. DOWNEY;); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Dolores Villanueva (Plaintiff); VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); Gloria Villanueva (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dolores Villanueva (Plaintiff); VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); Gloria Villanueva (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); GLORIA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff); MARY HIE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE: JURY FEES BY PLAINTIFFS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2015
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2015
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by VILLANUEVA, DOLORES by and through his (Plaintiff); GLORIA VILLANUEVA (Plaintiff); MARY HIE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant