This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2020 at 04:24:40 (UTC).

DMCF LLC ET AL VS CHARLES E FRADIN

Case Summary

On 04/15/2009 DMCF LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES E FRADIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT H. O'BRIEN, DAVID YAFFE and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1836

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

DAVID YAFFE

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CF STYLE

DMCF LLC

MCCALLEN DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

FRADIN CHARLES

FRADIN CHARLES E.

OLDS WILLIAM

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

FRADIN CHARLES E.

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DMCF LLC

MCCALLEN DAVID

JOHN ROSELLI & ASSOCIATES LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBERG & KOFFMAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE LLP

ELEY HUNTER R.

ROPERS MAJESKI KOWHN & BENTLEY

BURTON STEVEN E. ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREWS & ASSOCIATES

MEYERS MCCONNELL REISZ SIDERMAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

MARSTON NATHANIEL L ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Docketat 08:33 am in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; MOTION-RECONSIDERATION - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketReply to Motion (TO CHARLES FREADIN'S OPP. TO CROSS -DENT'S MOT. ON ALLICATION TO RECONSIDER AND MODIFY OR REVOKE PRIOR COURT ORDER; ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO MOTION ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (CHANGING HEARING DATE ON CROSS- DEFENDANT JOHN ROSSELLI AND ASSOCIATES, LTD.'S "MOTION ON APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER AND MODIFY OR REVOKE PRIOR COURT ORDER ON CROSS-COMPLAINT'S); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; MOTION - TAX COSTS - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketReply/Response (TO OPPOSITION ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF HEARINGS ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (shelley selip ); Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (OF HUNTER R. ELEY ); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (amended ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (WITH BC412323= DEPT. 39 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less