This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 10:04:22 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. HRIPSIME MINASYAN

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HRIPSIME MINASYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4907

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MINASYAN HRIPSIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICE LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Declaration (FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS CCP 1033 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Supplemental Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVE INTEREST CCP 585(d) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Supplemental Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER CCP 585(d) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Declaration (RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC064907    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: NCB

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

North Central District

Department B

discovery bank,

Plaintiff,

v.

hripsime minasyan,

Defendant.

Case No.: EC064907

Hearing Date: December 13, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to set aside the judgment pursuant to ccp §473(b)

BACKGROUND

A. Allegations of Complaint

Plaintiff Discover Bank (“Plaintiff”) filed this complaint against Defendant Hripsime Minasyan (“Defendant”) on January 28, 2016, alleging a single cause of action for common counts. Plaintiff alleges that within the past 4 years, there was a written account between the parties wherein Defendant is indebted to Plaintiff. The total sum is for $29,419.82.

B. Relevant Background and Motion to Vacate Default

The default of Defendant was entered on March 23, 2016.

On April 20, 2016, the default judgment of Defendant was entered in the amount of $29,923.82.

On September 24, 2019, Plaintiff filed the motion to set aside the entry of default judgment against Defendant. The Court is not in receipt of an opposition brief.

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff moves to set aside the entry of default entered against Defendant. Plaintiff states that unbeknownst to Plaintiff until after the entry of judgment, Defendant had passed away on January 2, 2016.

Plaintiff’s counsel, Abril Ruiz, states that Plaintiff had requested entry of default on March 23, 2016 and entry of default judgment on April 20, 2016, not knowing that Defendant had passed away. (Ruiz Decl., ¶3.)

The motion is not properly brought under CCP §473(b) as there is no showing that the default or default judgment were entered as a result of mistake, inadvertence, surprise, excusable neglect, or attorney fault, plus the motion was not brought within 6 months of the judgment.

Nevertheless, in light of the circumstances regarding entry of default and default judgment, the Court on will set aside the default and default judgment pursuant to CCP §473(d).

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motion to set aside the default judgment entered April 20, 2016 is granted pursuant to CCP §473(d).

The Court sets an OSC re Status of the Case and Whether Dismissal Should be Entered in light of Defendant’s death and a Case Management Conference for January 30, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

Plaintiff shall give notice of this order.