This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 18:50:33 (UTC).

DIKRAN ARMOUCHIAN VS GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2013 DIKRAN ARMOUCHIAN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC MARMARO and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7874

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC MARMARO

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMOUCHIAN DIKRAN

Defendants and Respondents

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

VOSKANIAN ERICK

DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

8/9/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8/9/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MALL?CIVIL

8/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MALL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/27/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAI!P?PEISONAI INJURY, PROPEITY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - LAMENDED (NUMBER): I

1/8/2014: COMPLAI!P?PEISONAI INJURY, PROPEITY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - LAMENDED (NUMBER): I

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/15/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

1/31/2014: Minute Order -

Proof of Service -

2/10/2014: Proof of Service -

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

3/7/2014: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/7/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order -

3/7/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

3/12/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/19/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/19/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order -

7/21/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

7/23/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/25/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/4/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAI!PPEISONAI INJURY, PROPEITY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - LAMENDED (NUMBER): I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dikran Armouchian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MALLCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dikran Armouchian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant