Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:33:38 (UTC).

DIAZ, RENE VS DIAZ, OLGA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 DIAZ, RENE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DIAZ, OLGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3643

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAZ RENE

Respondent

DIAZ OLGA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Brief (MSC ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Brief (MSC ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Support (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene - Hearing Set on 2017-02-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (10/12/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (10/12/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Diaz, Rene ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (10/12/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less