This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/29/2016 at 19:20:00 (UTC).

DIANE ROSS, ET-AL VS SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/08/2009 DIANE ROSS, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSE HOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3034

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSE HOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESKANDARI VIRGINIA PERSONAL REPRESENTAT

BALL FAYE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

HURNER CAROLYN K. PERSONAL REPRESENTATI

MCDADE MAMIE P. PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

CHARNLEY FRANK PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

RONQUILLO DELORES PERSONAL REPRESENTATI

BESTER TONYA PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

JACKSON REBECCA PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DEVINE OLTA PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

CLARK CAROL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

RICHARDSON AGNES M. PERSONAL REPRESENTA

GONZALES ELIAS L PERSONAL REPRESENTATIV

RUSSO ARLENE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

ROSS DIANE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

BUCHANAN JOHNETTA PERSONAL REPRESENTATI

BILLINGSLEY ALISON PERSONAL REPRESENTAT

RICHARDSON SHIRDENE PERSONAL REPRESENTA

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MILLER LAW FIRM LLC

Defendant Attorneys

REED SMITH LLP

KING & SPALDING LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2014
  • Receipt-Depository (for Defendant McKesson Corporation's Payment of its Complex Case Fee of $1,000 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Receipt-Depository (for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC's Payment of its Complex Case Fee of $1,000 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (COMPLEX FEE DUE MCKESSON CORP ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (COMPLEX FEE DUE GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (COMPLEX FEE DUE DIANE ROSS ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Notice (OF APPEARANCE AND SUB OF ATTY. HOKE IN PLACE OF DAVED C ANDERSEN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • Notice (OF ORDER COORIDINATING ACTION WITH JCCP 4578 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • Notice-Related Cases (R/W SEVERAL CASES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: GLAXOSMITHKLINE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.