This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:08:31 (UTC).

KAREN GREGORY ET AL VS 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 KAREN GREGORY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0298

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREGORY KAREN

GREGORY KATHLEEN

GREGORY DYLAN

GREGORY AMANDA

GREGORY MILES

Defendants

MEAD WESTVACO CORPORATION

BASF CATALYSTS LLC

DAP PRODUCTS INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

HENRY COMPANY LLC

THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY L.P.

SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

AMERON INTERNATINAL CORPORATION

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

Other Attorneys

FNSKLDFJS

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO PRECLUDE ANY DEFENDANT FROM ARGUING THAT A DEFENDANT'S COMPLIANCE WITH ANY GOVERNMENT SAFETY STANDARDS ABSOLVES THAT DEFENDANT FR

4/4/2018: DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO PRECLUDE ANY DEFENDANT FROM ARGUING THAT A DEFENDANT'S COMPLIANCE WITH ANY GOVERNMENT SAFETY STANDARDS ABSOLVES THAT DEFENDANT FR

DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO IRRELEVANT MEDICAL CONDITIONS

4/4/2018: DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO IRRELEVANT MEDICAL CONDITIONS

Request for Dismissal

8/1/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/19/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF KAREN GREGORY, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32

11/10/2016: DECLARATION OF KAREN GREGORY, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/5/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/5/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/5/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/5/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/5/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/21/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer

12/22/2016: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

3/2/2017: Substitution of Attorney

DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFTJL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICK LIABILITY; ETC.

3/27/2017: DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFTJL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICK LIABILITY; ETC.

DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "DAP PRODUCTS, INC.")'S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

3/27/2017: DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "DAP PRODUCTS, INC.")'S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Karen Gregory (Plaintiff); Miles Gregory (Plaintiff); Dylan Gregory (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Karen Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Karen Gregory (Plaintiff); Miles Gregory (Plaintiff); Dylan Gregory (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DECLARATION OF KAREN GREGORY, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY; FALSE REPRESENTATION; NEGLIGENCE - RESPIRATORY SAFETY DEVICE; STRICT LIABILITY - RESPIRATORY SAFETY DEVICE; AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HENRY COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY L.P. FKA THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY FKA HENRY ASPHALT COMPANY is a litigant