This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:11:16 (UTC).

KATHARINE MARINARO VS ERNEST VALLORANO III ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 KATHARINE MARINARO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERNEST VALLORANO III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0416

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINARO KATHARINE

Defendants and Respondents

VALLORANO ERNEST III

VALLORANO EMILY CHANG

M10 INC

27 MILES MALIBU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON & JOHNSON LLP

Defendant Attorney

ROZANSKY NICHOLAS A. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

DFSDFSD

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF NEVILLE JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/27/2017: DECLARATION OF NEVILLE JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH G. BALICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/25/2017: DECLARATION OF JOSEPH G. BALICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED CASE MANAAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/6/2017: AMENDED CASE MANAAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/25/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Unknown

1/31/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO LEAVE TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/25/2017: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO LEAVE TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

2/16/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/25/2017: DEFENDANTS' COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF KATHARINE MARINARO'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

10/25/2017: PLAINTIFF KATHARINE MARINARO'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

2/1/2017: JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

10/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6; ORDER THEREON

1/22/2018: STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6; ORDER THEREON

Minute Order

11/8/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

11/21/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Unknown

1/31/2017: Unknown

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 56; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 664.6; ORDER THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Katharine Marinaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Motion for Summary Adjudication; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Katharine Marinaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Katharine Marinaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Katharine Marinaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY - DIRECT CLAIM; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less