This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2015 at 23:19:03 (UTC).

DEVEN ORELLANA ET AL VS JOSE SANCHEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DEVEN ORELLANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOSE SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and ADR NEUTRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6910

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

ADR NEUTRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIDALGO LIDIA

ORELLANA DEVEN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

SANCHEZ CONSUELO

SANCHEZ DANILO

SANCHEZ JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN DEAN J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARSHA MUNEMURA

 

Court Documents

FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

6/23/2009: FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/23/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/31/2009: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

10/9/2009: PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

MINUTE ORDER

1/13/2010: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/14/2009: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/7/2009: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

GENERAL DENIAL

11/12/2008: GENERAL DENIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY

10/17/2008: DEMAND FOR JURY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/10/2009: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

MINUTE ORDER

2/13/2009: MINUTE ORDER

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL - EX PARTE

8/25/2008: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL - EX PARTE

Minute Order

2/26/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/9/2009: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/22/2008: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/23/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/17/2008: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

3/13/2009: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2009
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (DEVEN ORELLANA) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE-DEVEN ORELLANA, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise ( deven orellana ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • Statement-Agreement (Full) (FIRST SANA FILED MEDIATION ENDED IN FULL AGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2008
  • Cross-complaint ( ON BEHALF OF JOSE SANCHEZ, MARIA CONSUELO SANCHEZ AND DANILO SANCHEZ ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • Proof of Service (re: summons and complaint party served: counsuelo sanchez ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • Proof of Service (RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: JOSE SANCHEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • Proof of Service (re: summons and complaint party served: danilo sanchez ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (for Deven Orellana ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • Application-Miscellaneous (Guardian Ad Litem for Deven Orellana ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.