This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:47:45 (UTC).

DESIGN COLLECTION INC VS DAMO TEXTILE INC

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 DESIGN COLLECTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAMO TEXTILE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2713

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DESIGN COLLECTION INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DAMO CLOTHING

DAMO TEXTILE INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NICO N. TABIBI APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEUNG SHIRLEY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/26/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; ETC

8/26/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/1/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/26/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/4/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/28/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

2/10/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY LEUNG PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41

3/25/2016: DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY LEUNG PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/11/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/11/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 14; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Design Collection, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY LEUNG PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Damo Textile, Inc. (Defendant); Damo Clothing (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Design Collection, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Design Collection, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Design Collection, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Design Collection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAMO TEXTILES INC is a litigant