This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2017 at 22:01:53 (UTC).

DERRICK PALACIO VS ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 DERRICK PALACIO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9803

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALACIO DERRICK

Defendants and Respondents

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MICHAEL R. PARKER LAW PC

SEPULVEDA SANCHEZ LAW PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/19/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/19/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/8/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/4/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANT ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC.,'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/1/2016: DEFENDANT ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC.,'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/16/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/16/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) RACIAL DISCRIMINATION (GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ); ETC

8/5/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) RACIAL DISCRIMINATION (GOV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ); ETC

SUMMONS

8/5/2016: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AND AS TO THE COMPLAINT... *WITH PLAINTIFF'S SIGNATURE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketAnswer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less