This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2019 at 20:44:22 (UTC).

DERIKA MOSES VS HEALTHSMART PACIFIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2014 DERIKA MOSES filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HEALTHSMART PACIFIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5628

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOSES DERIKA

Defendants and Respondents

DROBOT MICHAEL D.

GARDENS REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CEN

HEALTHSMART PACIFIC INC.

PACIFIC HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

TRI-CITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

COMPREHENSIVE INTRA-OPERATIVE SYSTEMS

MCGRATH MICHAEL "MIC"

AHMED KHALID M.D.

WILLIAMS ROGER

UPPAL G. SUNNY M.D.

UPPAL GURVINDER SINGH M.D.

INTERNATIONAL IMPLAINTS LLC

ST. BERNARDINE MED. CENTER

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

FIELDS JEFFREY

AKAMAKJIAN JACK M.D.

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM L.P.

ORTHOPEDIC ALLIANCE LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HUTCHINSON ROBERT B. ESQ.

COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP

KNOX RICKSEN LLP

COBLENTZ PATCH DUFFY & BASS LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GARIA & PHAN A PROF. LAW CORP.

HERSHORIN & HENRY LLP

HERZFELD & RUBIN LAW OFFICES OF

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER

POLSINELLI LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice

12/18/2018: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BATTERY; ETC

8/22/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BATTERY; ETC

SUMMONS

8/22/2014: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/25/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/25/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

9/8/2014: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Unknown

9/25/2014: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/30/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/30/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/30/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/30/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/30/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

9/30/2014: Unknown

Unknown

9/30/2014: Unknown

Unknown

9/30/2014: Unknown

Unknown

9/30/2014: Unknown

Unknown

10/2/2014: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/6/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice (of Association of Counsel); Filed by Riverside Healthcare System, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 323; Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue (MOTION - CHANGE OF VENUE; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-07-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Derika Moses (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Parkview Community Hospital Medical (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Judgment; Filed by Parkview Community Hospital Medical (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Adoption of Master Answer; Filed by Riverside Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Riverside Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2014
  • Minute order entered: 2014-09-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Derika Moses (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gardens Regional Hospital Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ORTHOPEDIC ALLIANCE LLC is a litigant