This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:06:09 (UTC).

DEREK JAPHA ET AL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 DEREK JAPHA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6084

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KING PAUL

JAPHA DEREK

Respondents, Defendants and Interested Parties

DOES 1-20

SOUTH LOS ANGELES AREA PLANNING

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Interested Parties and Defendants

TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL

GOLDEN DAY SCHOLLS INC

DOES 1-20

PARKER CLARK

PARKER JEANETTE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/18/2016: SUMMONS

VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

11/18/2016: VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

11/18/2016: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

11/28/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

1ST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

12/20/2016: 1ST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/4/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • 1ST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Day Schools, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TODAY'S FRESH START INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant