This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 00:24:44 (UTC).

DENNIS JAMES YOUNG ET AL VS TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/26/2016 DENNIS JAMES YOUNG filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1988

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

YOUNG DENNIS JAMES

ESTATE OF WENDY JOY YOUNG THE

THE ESTATE OF WENDY JOY YOUNG

Respondents and Defendants

TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

SUN MARY YU M.D.

SNYDER MELVIN M.D.

BEDOLLA DARREN LEE M.D.

TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC.

MAK KEVIN LEO M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

MELVIN SNYDER M.D.

MARY Y SUN M.D.

DARREN LEE BEDOLLA M.D.

KEVIN LEO MAK M.D.

SNYDER MELVIN

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LEBOVITS MOSES A. ESQ.

LEBOVITS MOSES

NIKFARJAM PARHAM ANNETTE

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

DISCOE TONY A. ESQ.

RYAN RICHARD J. ESQ.

TAYLOR N. DENISE ESQ.

KELLY JOHN

NELSON ALPHONSIE

RYAN RICHARD J.

BUDICA STEPHEN EUGENE

BUTTS MELANIE COLLETTE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

6/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling

2/9/2022: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND FIVE YEAR RULE BY SIX MONTHS

2/4/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND FIVE YEAR RULE BY SIX MONTHS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 REGARDING THE PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE DEMONSTRATING NON-PARTY NEGLIGENCE

1/31/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 REGARDING THE PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE DEMONSTRATING NON-PARTY NEGLIGENCE

Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS

1/31/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS

Statement of the Case

1/31/2022: Statement of the Case

Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS

1/31/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS

Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 REGARDING CAUSATION

1/31/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 REGARDING CAUSATION

Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DECEDENTS PRIOR HEALTH AND INJURIES

1/31/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DECEDENTS PRIOR HEALTH AND INJURIES

Jury Instructions

1/31/2022: Jury Instructions

Exhibit List

1/31/2022: Exhibit List

Witness List

1/31/2022: Witness List

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION CONTESTING CODEFENDANTS DR. SUN, DR. BEDOLLA, AND TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLE

6/17/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION CONTESTING CODEFENDANTS DR. SUN, DR. BEDOLLA, AND TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/18/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

7/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Request for Refund / Order

7/30/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Declaration - DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT, TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, CONTESTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MARY Y. SUN, DARREN L. BEDOLLA,

9/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT, TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, CONTESTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MARY Y. SUN, DARREN L. BEDOLLA,

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Stipulation to Extend Five Year Rule by Six Months); Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 REGARDING CAUSATION; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 REGARDING THE PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE DEMONSTRATING NON-PARTY NEGLIGENCE; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Dennis James Young (Plaintiff); The Estate of Wendy Joy Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
388 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kevin Leo M.D. Mak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER AND KEVIN LEO MAK, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dennis James Young (Plaintiff); The Estate of Wendy Joy Young (Plaintiff); THE ESTATE OF WENDY JOY YOUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUDICA STEPHEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTTS MELANIE COLLETTE