This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2019 at 01:19:38 (UTC).

DENISE BAILEY ET AL VS HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 DENISE BAILEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4167

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BAILEY EDWARD DEWAYNE

BAILEY DENISE

BAILEY REGINALD

MEADOWS CHEVONDALYN

Defendants and Respondents

WENG JIAXIONG (JOSH). M.D

DORAISWAMY ASOK. M.D

HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION LTD

POWELL WES J. M.D.

CONRAD GARY L. M.D.

LEE HANSON T. M.D.

PENG TIEN M.D.

MOORE-JEFFRIES EARL WAYNE M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

WENG JIAXIONG JOSH. M.D

PENG M.D. TIEN

MOORE-JEFFRIES M.D. EARL WAYNE

LEE M.D. HANSON T.

POWELL M.D. WES J.

CONRAD M.D. GARY L.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF SEAN M. BURKE APC

BURKE SEAN M. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

BRANDMAYER KENT T. ESQ.

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

BRASLAVSKY VADIM

REBACK ROBERT C. ESQ.

LAW & BRANDMEYER LLP

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

SCHMID & VOILES

REBACK MCANDREWS & BLESSEY LLP

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAASFESLERSILBER

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. LAW OFFICES OF

PACKER O'LEARY & CORSON PLC

PACKER ROBERT B. ESQ.

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & HOUSOUER

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFIRES, M.D.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/29/2017: DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFIRES, M.D.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/29/2017: DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.

12/29/2017: DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.

NOTICE OF LODGING RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/29/2017: NOTICE OF LODGING RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EARL WAYNE MOORE-JEFFRIES, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT WES J. POWELL, M.D.'S SEPARRTE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUNMARY JUDGMENT

1/11/2018: DEFENDANT WES J. POWELL, M.D.'S SEPARRTE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUNMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF LODGING SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF WES J. POWELL, MD.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CRC, RULE 3.1350(G))

1/11/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF WES J. POWELL, MD.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CRC, RULE 3.1350(G))

DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. WACHTEL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT JIAXIONG (JOSH) WENG, M.D.

1/17/2018: DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. WACHTEL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT JIAXIONG (JOSH) WENG, M.D.

NOTICE OF LODGING SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JIAXIONG (JOSH) WENG, M.D'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CRC, RULE 3.1350(G))

1/17/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JIAXIONG (JOSH) WENG, M.D'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CRC, RULE 3.1350(G))

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/26/2018: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Motion for Summary Judgment -

8/24/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment -

Proof of Service -

3/20/2017: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

3/20/2017: Proof of Service -

PROOF OF SERVICE S&C

3/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE S&C

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/19/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/19/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/2/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/2/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/2/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice (of entry of dismissal and proof of service); Filed by Asok., M.D Doraiswamy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Denise Bailey (Plaintiff); Chevondalyn Meadows (Plaintiff); Reginald Bailey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by M.D., Hanson T. Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by M.D., Tien Peng (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
259 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Huntington Memorial Hospital (Defendant); Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Denise Bailey (Plaintiff); Chevondalyn Meadows (Plaintiff); Reginald Bailey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less