This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:18:50 (UTC).

DELRENNA SHERROD VS NAZAN NAZARYAN

Case Summary

On 08/11/2016 DELRENNA SHERROD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NAZAN NAZARYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0382

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHERROD DELRENNA

Defendants and Respondents

NAZARYAN NAZAN

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

B & D LAW GROUP APLC

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD & CANNON & SANTA CRUZ

MUHAR GEORGE

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

12/22/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GRAYSON L. SOBEL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/9/2018: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GRAYSON L. SOBEL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

5/22/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; ETC

9/18/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; ETC

Unknown

9/24/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/25/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Other -

11/14/2018: Other -

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Association of Attorney

3/19/2019: Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

4/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/11/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

8/16/2016: Unknown

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

11/15/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

12/1/2017: GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

12/1/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/1/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Nazan Nazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue the Trial Date Pursuant to Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue the Trial Date Pursuant to Stipulation); Filed by Nazan Nazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Nazan Nazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Nazan Nazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Other - (Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Compel); Filed by Nazan Nazaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Delrenna Sherrod (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Delrenna Sherrod (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Delrenna Sherrod (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Delrenna Sherrod (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC630382    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

DELRENNA SHERROD,

Plaintiff,

v.

NAZAN NAZARYN,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC630382

ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

The undersigned issues this order of disqualification pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 170.1(a)(6)(iii): “A person aware of the facts might reasonably entertain a doubt that the judge would be able to be impartial.” This case will be re-assigned at the direction of Department One, and the pending motion will be re-scheduled. The Court’s clerk shall give notice of this order.

DATED: November 4, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court