This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2020 at 02:14:09 (UTC).

DELMORGAN GROUP LLC VS LE JOLIE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 DELMORGAN GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LE JOLIE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5073

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DELMORGAN GROUP LLC

MORGANBESSER NEIL

DELGADO ROB

GLOBALIST CAPITAL LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LE JOLLIE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKLAR JEFFREY A.

MALONEY PATRICK MERRITT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ALEKSANDR GRUZMAN

MALONEY PATRICK M.

SINA REZA

Other Attorneys

GRUZMAN ALEKSANDR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)

Complaint -

12/4/2015: Complaint -

Legacy Document -

2/22/2016: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

4/1/2016: Legacy Document -

Case Management Statement -

5/5/2016: Case Management Statement -

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/3/2016: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document -

5/5/2017: Legacy Document -

Request for Judicial Notice -

5/5/2017: Request for Judicial Notice -

Legacy Document -

6/1/2017: Legacy Document -

Answer -

7/24/2017: Answer -

Legacy Document -

8/20/2018: Legacy Document -

Minute Order -

8/24/2018: Minute Order -

Legacy Document -

8/24/2018: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

8/24/2018: Legacy Document -

Substitution of Attorney -

8/29/2018: Substitution of Attorney -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/4/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Exhibit List - Exhibit List First Amended Joint Exhibit List

12/4/2018: Exhibit List - Exhibit List First Amended Joint Exhibit List

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Delmorgan Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Delmorgan Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF DELMORGAN GROUP LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; DECLARATION OF NICOLE A. POLTASH IN SUPPORT THEREOF; Filed by Delmorgan Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Aleksandr Gruzman (Attorney); Le Jollie LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by Le Jollie LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Delmorgan Group, LLC (Plaintiff); GLOBALIST CAPITAL LLC (Cross-Defendant); NEIL MORGANBESSER (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Le Jollie LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Le Jollie LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Le Jollie LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Le Jollie LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Delmorgan Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less