This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2016 at 07:04:15 (UTC).

DELACEY AT GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. VS. GREEN STREET VENTURE

Case Summary

On 02/15/2013 DELACEY AT GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GREEN STREET VENTURE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0964

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELACEY AT GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ADVANCED LANDSCAPE 200 INC.

BROWNING FIRE PROTECTION INC.

CONCRETE ART INC.

EXCEL DOOR & GATE COMPANY INC.

FORCE FRAMING INC.

GENERAL STEEL FABRICATORS INC.

GLASS FACTORY INC.

GREEN & DELACEY LLC

GREEN STREET VENTURE LLC

JOURNEY ELECTRICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

LAKEVIEW CONCRETE & MASONRY INC.

MOODY MASONRY INC.

OZONE ROOFING INC.

SEVEN SWORDS INTERNATIONAL INC.

SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION INC.

TRISTATE INC.

CELL-CRETE CORPORATION A CALIF. CORP.

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT ORTMANN PALFFY NIEVES DARLING & MAH

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

CHRISTENSEN EHRET LLP

JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D. COHEN

LORBER GREENFIELD POLITO & PENGILLY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/9/2013: SUMMONS

Unknown

5/15/2013: Unknown

Unknown

5/15/2013: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/23/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC; GREEN & DELACEY, LLC; AND SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 2. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; ETC

6/7/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC; GREEN & DELACEY, LLC; AND SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 2. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; ETC

DEFENDANTS GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC; GREEN & DELACEY, LLC; AND SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/7/2013: DEFENDANTS GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC; GREEN & DELACEY, LLC; AND SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST?CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

6/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST?CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOI ION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC ANI) FOR PROI)UCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANI)UM OF

6/25/2013: NOTICE OF MOI ION AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC ANI) FOR PROI)UCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANI)UM OF

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DOCUMENT REQUESTS I4 DISPUTE

6/25/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DOCUMENT REQUESTS I4 DISPUTE

DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. WOOLPALL IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, I1LC?S OBJECTION TO PLATNTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENI)ANT GREEN STREET VENTUR

6/28/2013: DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. WOOLPALL IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, I1LC?S OBJECTION TO PLATNTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENI)ANT GREEN STREET VENTUR

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

6/28/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT (;REEN STREET VENTURE, LLC AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARAT

6/28/2013: GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT (;REEN STREET VENTURE, LLC AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARAT

GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S T MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TD1 PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST.. KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC AND FOR PRODUCTION OF

7/12/2013: GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S T MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TD1 PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST.. KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC AND FOR PRODUCTION OF

DECLARATION OF J.D. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, TICS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC A

7/12/2013: DECLARATION OF J.D. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, TICS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC A

DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. WOOLFALL IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE

7/12/2013: DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. WOOLFALL IN SUPPORT OF GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEFENDANT GREEN STREET VENTURE

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal (AND PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN & DELACEY INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketBrief (RE: REMOVAL OF NON-ADMITTED EXHIBIT 594 INADVERTENTLY PROVIDED TO JURY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT, GREEN STREET VENTURE VENTURE, LLC TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (VERDICT FROM APPROVAL AND/OR EXEPTIONS NOTED FORM ) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketOpposition (TO GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketOpposition (TO SUFFOLK CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.'S MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT ON PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE; DECLARATION OF MITCHELL L. LEVERETT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (ON MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFEN- DANT, GREEN STREET VENTURE, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Motion (FOR DIRECTED VERDICT ON PLAIN- TIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN ITS OPERATIVE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
431 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2013
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt (Notice and aknowledgement of recei pt ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint (NO SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketNotice Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketNotice (CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DocketProof of Service Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OZONE ROOFING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL STEEL FABRICATORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOURNEY ELECTRICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAKEVIEW CONCRETE & MASONRY, INC. is a litigant