Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2018 at 17:01:33 (UTC).

DEBORAH HATCH VS. INEE CENDANA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 DEBORAH HATCH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against INEE CENDANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3648

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CARITAS HOSPICE INC.

CHI HEALTH IMMANUEL HOSPICE (DOE 1)

LONG LIFE HOME HEALTH

TRANQUILITY HOSPICE INC.

DASCO ELISA R.

IMMANUEL HOSPICE INC.

LOREZCO TERESITA

PUCKETT KENT

WINDOWS OF BLESSING IN CHRIST INT'L

MOSLARES-LOMBARD EDITH

REYES ELISHA

THE MASTER'S HOME FOR JOYFUL LIVING

VALENCIANO ROSARIO

VALENCIANO PINKY

REYES ELISA V.

LIFELINE HOME HEALTH

INCARNACION INEE

RAMS LYNN

SISON PINKY

REYES LISA

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ESKIN SHELDON J.

CANTOR JON D.

RAMSEY WILLIAM RAY

LOPEZ EDGARDO MORALES

MARCUS RICHARD ADAM

Other Attorneys

STEIN JAY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

7/16/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney

8/2/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

8/2/2018: Answer

Answer

8/14/2018: Answer

Answer

8/14/2018: Answer

Answer

8/24/2018: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

8/24/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

8/24/2018: Answer

Answer

8/27/2018: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint; Filed by Marilyn Folks (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint; Filed by Rodilyn Almuete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint; Filed by Edith Moslares Lombard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff); Pristine Home Health Providers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Caritas Home Health Providers, Inc., a (Plaintiff); Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Deborah Hatch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC103648    Hearing Date: March 11, 2021    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING

REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY PLAINTIFF DEBORAH HATCH

3/11/2021

THE COURT REQUESTS STATUS OF THE PENDING CRIMINAL CHARGES AGAINST MS. HATCH.  THE COURT IS CONSIDERING NOT STAYING THE ENTIRE ACTION BUT POSSIBLY STAYING ANY FURTHER TESTIMONY FROM THE PLAINTIFF PENDING THE CRIMINAL CHARGES.  THIS WOULD ALLOW THE CASE TO PROCEED.  AT A MINIMUM, THERE IS NO REASON WHY THE DEFENSE CASE CANNOT PROCEED.  ANOTHER ISSUE TO BE DISCUSSED IS THE FACT THAT THE CRIMINAL CHARGES WERE BROUGHT AFTER THE CASE PROCEEDED.  IN OTHER WORDS, MS. HATCH BROUGHT THIS LAWSUIT SEVERAL YEARS AGO WITHOUT KNOWING THAT CRIMINAL CHARGES WOULD LATER BE BROUGHT AGAINST HER.  SHOULD THE COURT CONSIDER THIS ISSUE?  THE COURT ACKNOWLEDGES THAT A PLAINTIFF WHO VOLUNTARILY FILES A LAWSUIT AND THEN ELECTS TO REST ON A 5TH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE MAY RESULT IN THE CASE BEING DISMISSED IF SHE REFUSES TO TESTIFY.  THE COURT ALSO NOTES, HOWEVER, THAT SHE IS A DEFENDANT WHO HAS BEEN INVOLUNTARILY BROUGHT INTO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT. THE COURT INVITES ORAL ARGUMENT ON THESE ISSUES AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING.