Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:12:42 (UTC).

DEBORAH DENISE PHINISEE VS LUIS SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 DEBORAH DENISE PHINISEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUIS SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6967

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHINISEE DEBORAH DENISE

Respondent

SANTIAGO LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Phinisee, Deborah ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (personal )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-09-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Phinisee, Deborah ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Phinisee, Deborah ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less