This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2016 at 09:46:07 (UTC).

DEBORAH ADAIR VS PETER SWANKE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2011 DEBORAH ADAIR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PETER SWANKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARMARO, MARC. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2074

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARMARO, MARC

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADAIR DEBORAH

Respondent

SWANKE PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAPIN IAN STANTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Order-Withhold Income-Child Suppt Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Stipulation-Waive Service Dec Disc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Declaration-Default Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Request-Enter Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Judgmt-Pkg Rec'd & Pending-Aft Hrg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2013
  • Stipulation-Waive Service Dec Disc Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Declaration-Income & Expense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • OSC-Custody, Support, etc. Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Notice-Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less