This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 06:16:08 (UTC).

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS JOHNNY BURBANK INC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2010 DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHNNY BURBANK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARIA E. STRATTON and BERT GLENNON, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0781

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARIA E. STRATTON

BERT GLENNON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendants

AZININAN ROBERT

AZINIAN JR. ROBERT

AZINIAN KARINA

JOHNNY BURBANK INC

DOES 1-100

Not Classified By Court

FAIRMAN ROBERT L. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIBERI SANDRA ILENE

Defendant Attorney

TILLIPMAN JAMES MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department T; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketNotice-Motion; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketStatement-Separate-of Undisputed F; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; (OSC-Dismissal; OSC-Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Docket(Request-Dismissal); Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; (OSC-Dismissal; Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNNY BURBANK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where De Lage Landen Financial Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIBERI SANDRA