This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 02:07:30 (UTC).

D.C ET AL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 D C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0437

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

CONTRERAS SONIA

DOE JANE RA

AMIGON BELEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

BALLARD-TREPTOW ALICE

Minors

L.C

D.C

Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

AMIGON BELEN

BIVIANO GENEOVEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARRILLO LUIS ALLEN

CARRILLO LUIS ALLEN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GONZALEZ HENRY HERNANDEZ ESQ.

ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

Minor Attorneys

CARRILLO LUIS A. ESQ.

MANLY JOHN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

12/6/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S LIMITED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASE

1/22/2018: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S LIMITED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASE

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 128.7; DECLARATION OF ANDRE V. BATES

8/31/2018: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 128.7; DECLARATION OF ANDRE V. BATES

DFFFNDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; ETC

12/18/2017: DFFFNDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE RE LAUSD'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE RE LAUSD'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

Minute Order

10/2/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/24/2018: Notice of Ruling

REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR RECORDS OF ALHAMBRA HIGH SCHOOL

4/14/2017: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR RECORDS OF ALHAMBRA HIGH SCHOOL

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/2/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

10/2/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/14/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION, NEGLIGENT HIRING AND/OR RETENTION

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION, NEGLIGENT HIRING AND/OR RETENTION

PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT LAUSD PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 128.7; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $14,750.00; ETC.

7/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT LAUSD PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 128.7; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $14,750.00; ETC.

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LAUSD'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED, ETC

4/23/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LAUSD'S PERSON MOST QUALIFIED, ETC

Minute Order

4/21/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' D.C. AND L.C.'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/30/2018: PLAINTIFFS' D.C. AND L.C.'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate (Case No. BC718722 (Jane Ra Doe) with Lead Case No. BC640437 (Res ID8722)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Gail Peeples, CSR#11458); Filed by Sonia Contreras (Plaintiff); Jane Ra Doe (Plaintiff); D.C , a minor (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Case No BC718722 with Lead Case); Filed by Sonia Contreras (Plaintiff); Geneovea Biviano (Non-Party); Belen Amigon (Non-Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Belen Amigon (Non-Party); Geneovea Biviano (Non-Party); Sonia Contreras (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Case No. BC718722 with Lead Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Motion to Consolidate (Case No. BC718722 with Lead Case No. BC640437); Filed by D.C , a minor (Plaintiff); L.C. , a minor (Plaintiff); Jane K.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION, NEGLIGENT HIRING AND/OR RETENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by D.C , a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less