This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 02:28:35 (UTC).

DC ELECTRICAL COMPANY VS JORDAN KIRK HAGE ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 DC ELECTRICAL COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JORDAN KIRK HAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0286

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

DC ELECTRICAL COMPANY

KEMP KEITH

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

J HAGE CONSTRUCTION

HAGE JORDAN KIRK

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. THE

TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC THE

SWATCH GROUP U.S. INC. THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PORTER LAW GROUP INC.

Defendant Attorney

JUNG KAREN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/28/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/12/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/22/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER OF JORDAN KIRK HAGE, THE TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC, THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. AND OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT

1/5/2017: ANSWER OF JORDAN KIRK HAGE, THE TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC, THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. AND OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

11/30/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

7/5/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

11/30/2016: PROOF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/14/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

3/1/2017: Unknown

CROSS COMPLAINT OF JORDAN KIRK HAGE, D.B.A. J HAGE CONSTRUCTION

1/5/2017: CROSS COMPLAINT OF JORDAN KIRK HAGE, D.B.A. J HAGE CONSTRUCTION

Minute Order

7/7/2017: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC

ANSWER OF DC ELECTRICAL COMPANY TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/15/2017: ANSWER OF DC ELECTRICAL COMPANY TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/18/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING

8/16/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Jordan Kirk Hage (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Taubman Company LLC, The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • PROOF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less