This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 16:35:16 (UTC).

DAYSE MACIAS ET AL VS SB MANHATTAN LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2013 DAYSE MACIAS filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SB MANHATTAN LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, EMILIE H. ELIAS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2339

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

EMILIE H. ELIAS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MACIAS ANDREW

MACIAS DAYSE

Defendants and Respondents

5TH STREET LOFT LLC

6TH ST. LOFT LLC

DTLA MANAGEMENT LLC

MAIN SB LLC

MANHATTAN LOFT LLC

SB DOWNTOWN PROPERTIES 26 LLC

SB DOWNTOWN PROPERTIES LLC

SB GRAND TERRACE PROPERTIES LLC

SB MAIN STREET LLC

SB MANHATTAN LLC

SB PROPERTIES LLC

SB PROPERTIES LP

SB SPRING LLC

SB TOWER LLC

SHY BARRY

VAULT LOUNGE LLC

Other

DERUBERTIS DAVID M. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

KHORRAMI BOUCHER LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SICILIANO NICHOLAS A. LAW OFFICES OF

WEEKS DAVID E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/29/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

7/20/2017: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/29/2017: Minute Order

SUMMONS

9/24/2013: SUMMONS

Brief

10/18/2017: Brief

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

11/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

COMPLAINT (1) VIOLATION OF CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 1950.5; ETC

9/24/2013: COMPLAINT (1) VIOLATION OF CAL. CIVIL CODE ? 1950.5; ETC

Minute Order

11/1/2017: Minute Order

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

8/31/2017: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Minute Order

11/14/2017: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/1/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

7/19/2017: Minute Order

Brief

11/8/2017: Brief

Stipulation

3/15/2017: Stipulation

Notice of Ruling

10/5/2017: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation

6/8/2017: Stipulation

Order

11/14/2017: Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/19/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • Proof of Service (DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MSA; MEMO OF P&A AND 2) DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ......) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Reply/Response (DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MSA; MEMO OF P&A ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Objection Document (DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MSA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S MSA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S MSA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Reply/Response (PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MSA; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS A SICILIANO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues (DEFENDNAT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MSA; MEMO OF P&A IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Proof of Service (DEFENDANT MANHATTAN LOFT, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MSA, SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND APPENDIX OF NON- CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2013
  • Notice (of posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Notice (of posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Report-Status (JOINT initial S/C class action response statement ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Notice (OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Notice (of orders dated 11/07/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Order (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.