This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 18:02:41 (UTC).

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION VS. ISSAC NORMAN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2014 DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISSAC NORMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN, ALLAN J. GOODMAN and H. CHESTER HORN, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2089

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION

DAYANI DAVOUD

DAYANI SHAHIN OHEBSION

Defendants

NORMAN ISAAC

MAHBAN HAMID

MORADSHAHI ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO

ALPER ANDREW K.

Defendant Attorneys

AFFELD GRIVAKES ZUCKER LLP

LEICHTER KEVIN J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Second Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO STAY THE 08/28/15 ORDER PENDING THE DETERMINATION OF NORMAN'S WRIT OF MANDATE AND TO CLARIFY THE DATE OF COMPLIANCE FOR THE 08/28/15 ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Order Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMP. AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Notice (OF COURT-REQUESTED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN CONNECTION WITH HEARING ON DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION'S DEMURRER TO AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF ISSAC NORMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Demurrer (TO AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURTY TRIAL OF ISSAC NORMAN TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Answer (VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL "FILED BY FAX ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Answer (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC122089    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: P

 

Dayco Funding Corporation v. Isaac Norman, Case No. SC122089

Hearing Date: February 27, 2020

Attorney Leichter’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Kevin J. Leichter filed a motion to be relieved as counsel for defendant Isaac Norman. Based

on an attached declaration, Leichter seeks to have the court find no conflict, deny the motion, and allow him to continue his representation. Leichter’s current law partner, Larry Ecoff, previously represented plaintiff Dayco Funding Corp. and its principal H. Sean Dayani in unrelated matters. Leichter states plaintiff has not waived any potential conflict, so he asks the court to determine whether Ecoff’s prior representation of an adverse party requires his withdrawal.

An attorney’s conflict is imputed to the law firm as a whole. City and County of San Francisco v. Cobra Solutions, Inc. (2006) 38 Cal.4th 839, 847. In California, simultaneous representation of two clients with adverse interests creates a per se conflict of interest, justifying automatic disqualification. Blue Water Sunset LLC v. Markowitz (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 477, 487. Simultaneous representation is disqualifying, regardless of whether the simultaneous representations are related. People ex rel. Dept. of Corporations v. SpeeDee Oil Change Systems, Inc. (1999) 20 Cal.4th 1135, 1147. The burden is on the party seeking disqualification. Shen v. Miller (2012) 212 Cal.App.4th 48, 56.

Leichter argues Ecofff’s representation of Dayco was in the past and is unrelated to the current action. Plaintiffs argue Ecoff still represents Dayco, creating a current conflict of interest imputed by law to Leichter. The reply argues plaintiffs show no evidence proving the existence of an existing attorney-client relationship.

Dayani’s declaration states Ecoff represents him personally, as well as Dayco, and he contacted Ecoff “numerous times regarding legal advice for myself, my family and our various businesses and continue[s] to do so.” Dayani Decl. at ¶¶4-6. Though Leichter argues the declaration is ambiguous, it states Ecoff continues to provide legal advice to Dayani regarding Dayco. This establishes an attorney-client relationship between Ecoff and Dayani that is attributable to Leichter. Plaintiffs carry the burden to show concurrent representation and an existing conflict of interest. GRANTED.