This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 08:55:33 (UTC).

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION VS HENRY DANPOUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2012 DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HENRY DANPOUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT H. O'BRIEN, MARY H. STROBEL, MARY ANN MURPHY, LUIS A. LAVIN, RONALD M. SOHIGIAN and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6328

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

MARY H. STROBEL

MARY ANN MURPHY

LUIS A. LAVIN

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COHEN MENASHI

DANPOUR HENRY

CROSSPOINT DEVELOPMENT LLC

AVENUE K1753 LLC

REGENCY PROPERTIES LLC

Cross Defendants

DAYANI SEAN

EASTERN MORTGAGE COMPANY

SHAIKIN JOHN R.

YONA RONNIE

Others

HOMAYOUN DAYANI SEAN

DAYANI H. SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ALPER ANDREW K. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARNESS CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

BEROKIM KOUSHA

FENSTER FRED A. ESQ.

GLASER WEIL FINK JACOBS HOWARD AVCHEN

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. O'REILLY

LICHT JEFFREY L. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. O'REILLY

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: BOND POSTED

1/29/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: BOND POSTED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: WRIT-OTHER ISSUED

1/30/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: WRIT-OTHER ISSUED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

7/13/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

Appeal - Remittitur - Other - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - OTHER B278055

3/25/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Other - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - OTHER B278055

Stipulated Judgment

3/26/2019: Stipulated Judgment

Request for Refund / Order

7/5/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Order - ORDER PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT

7/26/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MENASHI COHEN ON COMPLAINT AND SEVERANCE OF JU

10/8/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MENASHI COHEN ON COMPLAINT AND SEVERANCE OF JU

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW K. ALPER IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COH

12/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW K. ALPER IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COH

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RONNIE AU CED A IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AGAINST MENASHI COHEN

12/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RONNIE AU CED A IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AGAINST MENASHI COHEN

Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MENASHI COHEN ON COMPLAINT AND SEVERANCE OF JUDGMENT [CODE OF CIV.

12/6/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MENASHI COHEN ON COMPLAINT AND SEVERANCE OF JUDGMENT [CODE OF CIV.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION ...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PAR TE APPLICATION OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COHE

12/6/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PAR TE APPLICATION OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COHE

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/30/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Writ issued

8/12/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Writ issued

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SALE OF DWELLING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL THE SHERIFF TO SELL THE DWELLING; ETC

12/5/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SALE OF DWELLING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL THE SHERIFF TO SELL THE DWELLING; ETC

DECLARATION OF MARSHALL J. AUGUST RE EX PARTE NOTICE

12/5/2017: DECLARATION OF MARSHALL J. AUGUST RE EX PARTE NOTICE

Minute Order -

1/8/2018: Minute Order -

340 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46, Frederick C. Shaller, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COHEN) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment ([PROPOSED] JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MENASHI COHEN ON COMPLAINT AND SEVERANCE OF JUDGMENT [Code of Civ. Proc. section 579].); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (EX PAR TE APPLICATION OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COHEN); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW K. ALPER IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IN FAVOR OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION AND AGAINST MENASHI COHEN); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF RONNIE AU CED A IN SUPPORT OF EX P ARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AGAINST MENASHI COHEN); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation for entry of judgment in favor of plaintiff Dayco Funding Corporation and against defendant Menashi Cohen on Complaint and Severance of Judgment); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT); Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
761 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGIMNT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF REPAYMENT GUARANTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dayco Funding Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

° ® ORIGINAL [

Andrew K. Alper (State Bar No. 088876) F KLED

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO, L.C. 32

1000 Wilshire Boulevard : B2 Nineteenth Floor | 32016 Los Angeles, California 90017-2427

Telephone: (323) 852-1000 | SHERAIR. CUTIVE OFFICER/ CLERK Facsimile: (323) 651-2577 | REC'D gy e ceruTy Attorneys for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Fl £B d 8 201 DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION R b

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

| DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a CASE No. BC476328

[PROPSSED] JUDGMENT OF

V. DISMISSAL OF THIRD AMENDED

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HENRY DANPOUR AGAINST DAYCO FUNDING

CORPORATION, SEAN DAYANI, EASTERN MORTGAGE COMPANY, AND JOHN R. SHAIKIN

HENRY DANPOUR; and DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive,

Defendants. Date: February §, 2016

Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept.. 46

HENRY DANPOUR, Cross-Complainant, V.

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, a California Corporation; SEAN DAYANI, aka H. SEAN DAYANI, aka SEAN HOMAYOUN DAYANI, an individual; EASTERN MORTGAGE COMPANY, a corporation; JOHN R. SHAIKIN, an individual; and ROES 1-30,

S —

JIAULTLiFU G

[PROETSE D] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HENRY

DANPOUR AGAINST DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, SEAN DAYANI, EASTERN MORTGAGE

COMPANY, AND JOHN R. SHAIKIN

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avenue K1753, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Regency Properties, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dayco Funding Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LICHT JEFFREY L.