This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 08:48:13 (UTC).

DAVID VILLEGAS VS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2016 DAVID VILLEGAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS and HELEN I. BENDIX. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6797

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

HELEN I. BENDIX

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLEGAS DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

DAVIS BOB

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC.

LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT WAREHOUSE INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAVID R. DENIS P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HUNTON & WILLIAMS LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/13/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

4/13/2016: Unknown

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/27/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE: CAMERON CASEY

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE: CAMERON CASEY

Unknown

8/9/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/9/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

1/3/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF SANTOS NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/3/2017: DECLARATION OF SANTOS NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW I. BOBB IN SUPPORT OF LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/3/2017: DECLARATION OF MATTHEW I. BOBB IN SUPPORT OF LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF'S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS LODGED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/5/2017: PLAINTIFF'S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS LODGED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSING SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY A

4/5/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSING SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY A

DEFENDANTS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/14/2017: DEFENDANTS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/14/2017: DEFENDANTS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC'S AND BOB DAVIS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF DAVID VILLEUAS' OBJECTIONS TO NEW EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENDANTS IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/17/2017: PLAINTIFF DAVID VILLEUAS' OBJECTIONS TO NEW EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENDANTS IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

4/25/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/25/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/10/2017: Minute Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal ( WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • at 11:00 am in Department 18, Helen I. Bendix, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (d.20no future msc's to be set.) - Non-Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • at 11:00 am in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Order (GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONT. TRIAL IS SIGNED ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT. TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • at 11:15 am in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Granted in Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • at 06:00 pm in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REVISED RULING ON DEFTS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC AND BOB DAVIS' MSJ OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Court's Ruling on Defendants Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Bob Davis ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND; OSC RE: P.O.S.all defendants*please refer to the the dept'swebsite at wwwlacourt.org______) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less