This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2020 at 11:45:02 (UTC).

DAVID SHUPAK VS DEBRA L REED ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2016 DAVID SHUPAK filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against DEBRA L REED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7444

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHUPAK DAVID

Defendants

REED DEBRA L.

BROCKSMITH JAMES G. JR.

HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A.

RUTLEDGE WILLIAM P.

BOECKMANN ALAN L.

FURGERSON SCOTT

MINTER GEORGE

SEMPRA ENERGY

RUSNACK WILLIAM C.

BIRD JUSTIN C.

BROWN KATHLEEN L.

SCHENK LYNN

FERRERO PABLO A.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

ARRIOLA DENNIS V.

JONES WILLIAM D.

SCHNEIDER DOUG

SCHNEIDER MICHAEL M.

YARDLEY JAMES C.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRONGAY ROBERT VINCENT

Defendant Attorneys

NOLAN THOMAS J.

DICANIO JACK PATRICK

GOODING ROBERT ELLIOTT JR

CLOSE MATTHEW W.

RISSIER JOHN WARREN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

12/2/2016: Minute Order -

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCES

8/22/2016: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCES

Notice of Appearance

8/22/2016: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANTS SEMPRA ENERGY AND SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

8/19/2016: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANTS SEMPRA ENERGY AND SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SUMMONS -

4/19/2016: SUMMONS -

VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

4/19/2016: VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re Reassignment)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re Reassignment)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Re-Assignment)

1/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Re-Assignment)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION RE PRIVATE PLAINTI...)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION RE PRIVATE PLAINTI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE OF SEMPRA ENER...)

8/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE OF SEMPRA ENER...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2025
  • Hearing01/02/2025 at 16:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (ReDeveloper Plaintiffs' permanent nuisance claims) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Re Private Plaintiffs' permanent nuisance claims) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (for Special Jury Instruction RePermanent Nuisance) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Re Private Plainti...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (of Directors Defendants [BC611319 - Kanter], [BC617444 - Shupak], [37-2-16-000058421-CU-BT-CTL - Firemen's Retirements System of St. Louis], [BC664302 - Favors]) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (of Sempra Energy [BC611319 - Kanter], [BC617444 - Shupak], [37-2016-00005842-CU-BT-CTL - Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis], [BC664302 - Favors]) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (of Officer Defendants [BC611319 - Kanter], [BC617444 - Shupak], [37-2016-00005842-CUBT-CTL - Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis], [BC664302 - Favors]) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike of Sempra Ener...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (of Directors Defendants [BC611319 - Kanter], [BC617444 - Shupak], [37-2-16-000058421-CU-BT-CTL], [BC664302 - Favors]) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Shupak (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketVERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Warren Rissier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Nolan