This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 10:34:25 (UTC).

DAVID SCHROEDER VS MICHAEL LAVALLEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/29/2013 DAVID SCHROEDER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL LAVALLEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0150

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SCHROEDER DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

BROADBAND REALTY ADVISORS LLC

DOES 1-20

LAVALLEE MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STAUB D. JOSHUA ESQ.

KOURY KENNETH P. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE RELIEF FROM DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP ? 437; DECLARATION OF CHAD BIGGINS; DECLARATION OF MICHAL LAVALLEE

6/19/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE RELIEF FROM DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP ? 437; DECLARATION OF CHAD BIGGINS; DECLARATION OF MICHAL LAVALLEE

Minute Order -

9/15/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/7/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION SET ONE ADMITTED AND CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISHED AND FOR AN ORDER

2/17/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION SET ONE ADMITTED AND CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISHED AND FOR AN ORDER

PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER'S NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

3/2/2015: PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER'S NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

3/25/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Minute Order -

3/27/2015: Minute Order -

OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF RULING BY PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER; NOTICE OF HEARINGS

4/8/2015: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF RULING BY PLAINTIFF DAVID SCHROEDER; NOTICE OF HEARINGS

OPPOSITION BY CHAD BIGGINS TO REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN ALL MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF; AND REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC STAY BECAUSE MICHAEL LAVALLEE HAS FILED FOR BANKRUPTCY - C

5/11/2015: OPPOSITION BY CHAD BIGGINS TO REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN ALL MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF; AND REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC STAY BECAUSE MICHAEL LAVALLEE HAS FILED FOR BANKRUPTCY - C

Minute Order -

5/27/2015: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE AFFIDAVIT OF D. JOSHUA STAUB INITIATING INDIRECT CONTEMPT PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV. PRO. SECTION 1211 AGAINST MARY LOU LAVALLEE

8/4/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE AFFIDAVIT OF D. JOSHUA STAUB INITIATING INDIRECT CONTEMPT PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV. PRO. SECTION 1211 AGAINST MARY LOU LAVALLEE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/11/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

9/23/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE -CIVIL

9/29/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE -CIVIL

NOTICE ENTRY JUDGMENT/ORDER FILING DISMISS & PROOF OF SERVICE -

10/16/2015: NOTICE ENTRY JUDGMENT/ORDER FILING DISMISS & PROOF OF SERVICE -

Minute Order -

2/26/2016: Minute Order -

ORDER TO ACCEPT AUTHENTICATED COPY OF NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

7/13/2016: ORDER TO ACCEPT AUTHENTICATED COPY OF NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/13/2016: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; (OSC-Failure to 'OTHER'; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by David Schroeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by David Schroeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketTHIRD SEPARATE SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketORDER TO ACCEPT AUTHENTICATED COPY OF NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by David Schroeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David Schroeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Schroeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREECH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.