This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:43:18 (UTC).

DAVID SARABIA ORTIZ VS. BLACK & WHITE GARAGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 DAVID SARABIA ORTIZ filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BLACK WHITE GARAGE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7262

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ DAVID SARABIA

Defendants

BLACK & WHITE GARAGE INC.

ALDERMAN & HILGERS LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN ERIC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department F47; (Request for Dismissal; ENTERED) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DAVID SARABIA ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by BLACK & WHITE GARAGE, INC. (Defendant); ALDERMAN & HILGERS, LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BLACK & WHITE GARAGE, INC. (Defendant); ALDERMAN & HILGERS, LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DAVID SARABIA ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by BLACK & WHITE GARAGE, INC. (Defendant); ALDERMAN & HILGERS, LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADLERMAN & HILGERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACK & WHITE GARAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN ERIC