This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 01:48:56 (UTC).

DAVID SARABIA ET AL VS MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURATING CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2013 DAVID SARABIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURATING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, ROBERT A. DUKES, OKI, DAN THOMAS, TERESA A. BEAUDET and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4993

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

ROBERT A. DUKES

OKI, DAN THOMAS

TERESA A. BEAUDET

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARABA DAVID

SARABIA ANN

Claimant

SNAP-ON

Defendants and Respondents

3M COMPANY

3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC

AIRGAS INC. (ROE 8)

CINCINNATI COMMERCIAL CORP.

CINCINNATI MILACRON COMMERCIAL CORP.

CINCINNATI MILACRON INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FORTUNE INTERNATIONAL INC. (DOE 1)

FORTUNE INTERNATIONAL INC. (ROE 2)

MACHINERY SOLUTIONS INC

MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

MILACRON INC.

MILACRON LLC

MSC INDUSTRIAL DIRECT CO. INC. (ROE 3)

MSC INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY CO. INC. (DOE 2)

MSC INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY CO. INC. (ROE 1)

TAIWAN MACHINERY TRADE CENTER (ROE 5)

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRASSINI WRINKLE & JOHNSON

GRASSINI LAWRENCE P. ESQ.

Claimant Attorney

S. HENSLEE SMITH LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BAZAZ GINA

BOONE MORDECAID ESQ.

BROWN JAY D. ESQ.

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R. ESQ.

HEFFERNAN KEVIN N. ESQ.

LIN JAY J. ESQ.

GORDON & REES LAW OFFICES OF

FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & KLEIN LLP

BAZAZ GINA ESQ.

SANTOCHI VICTOR W. ESQ.

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R. LAW OFFICES OF

JAY J. LIN LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS D'AMATO BRISBOIS & BISGAARD

GORDON & REES LLP

KIRK ZURAWSKI & MYERS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BAZAZ GINA ESQ.

SANTOCHI VICTOR W. ESQ.

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R. LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS D'AMATO BRISBOIS & BISGAARD

Other Attorneys

STOLL RICHARD M. ESQ.

MYERS JEFFREY C.

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/19/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/20/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINAINT, MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., D/B/A THEMAC INC.'S, CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR APPOINTMENT OF FAULT, COMPARATIVE NEGLIGENCE, DECLARATORY RELIEF, EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

6/11/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINAINT, MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., D/B/A THEMAC INC.'S, CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR APPOINTMENT OF FAULT, COMPARATIVE NEGLIGENCE, DECLARATORY RELIEF, EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/27/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 3M COMPANY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

10/25/2013: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 3M COMPANY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIEN AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

1/24/2014: NOTICE OF LIEN AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/14/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/11/2014: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

5/2/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/22/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

CR0SS-DEFENDANT FORTUNE INTERNATIONAL, INC.?S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/22/2014: CR0SS-DEFENDANT FORTUNE INTERNATIONAL, INC.?S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/24/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION AND CONTINUED TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES

11/7/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION AND CONTINUED TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION CONTESTING THE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAY D. BROWN

1/14/2015: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION CONTESTING THE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAY D. BROWN

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED FOR MACHINERY SOLUTIONS. INC.. AND ETC

1/15/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED FOR MACHINERY SOLUTIONS. INC.. AND ETC

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED FOR MACHINERY SOLUTIONS, INC., AND JAMES HUANG, AND TO C

1/21/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MCGONEGAL MANUFACTURING CO., INC., TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED FOR MACHINERY SOLUTIONS, INC., AND JAMES HUANG, AND TO C

ROE AMENDMENT TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT MSC INDUSTRIAL DIRECT CO., INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/13/2015: ROE AMENDMENT TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT MSC INDUSTRIAL DIRECT CO., INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department J; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department J; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department J; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
504 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by David Saraba (Plaintiff); Ann Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by David Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES - STRICT PRODUCT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENT PRODUCT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE; LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Saraba (Plaintiff); David Sarabia (Plaintiff); Ann Sarabia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES - STRICT PRODUCT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENT PRODUCT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE; LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant