This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:55:32 (UTC).

DAVID S LINDLEY ET AL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2015 DAVID S LINDLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6886

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LINDLEY DAVID S.

SENNHAUSER MAUREEN K.

LINDLEY DAVID W.

THE ESTATE OF DAVID W. LINDLEY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

DIEGO GRACIELA

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

EXPOSITION METRO LINE CONSTRUCTION

KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES INC.

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

SIMMONS GHIA

SKANSKA-RADOS EXPO 2 JOINT VENTURE

EXPOSITION METRO LINE CONSTRUCTION CO.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN...

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Defendant and Respondent

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Others

HALLISY ERIN O. ESQ.

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCH &LEBOVITS

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL J. CURLS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MARKHAM KEEVIL L. ESQ.

MANDELL DAMON & ASSOCIATES LLP

KANDARIAN-STEIN GINA Y.

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR+ STEWART LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMTIH

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY V. DEBERNARD

MATSUDA JANE O. ESQ.

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR + STEWART LLP

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

 

Court Documents

GHIA SIMMONS'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/10/2015: GHIA SIMMONS'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

GRACIELA DIEGO'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY AND CONTRIBUTION

6/11/2015: GRACIELA DIEGO'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY AND CONTRIBUTION

DEFENDANT KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EQUITABLE RELIEF 2. CONTRIBUTION 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/24/2015: DEFENDANT KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EQUITABLE RELIEF 2. CONTRIBUTION 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/7/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

GHIA SIMMONS'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES

7/29/2015: GHIA SIMMONS'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KIMLEY-HORN AND ASSOCIATES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/25/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/30/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/13/2016: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/16/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/6/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT GRACIELA DIEGO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FRANK L. KURASZ

9/8/2016: DEFENDANT GRACIELA DIEGO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FRANK L. KURASZ

DEFENDANT GRACIELA DIEGO'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OFF-CALENDAR

9/16/2016: DEFENDANT GRACIELA DIEGO'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OFF-CALENDAR

Minute Order

9/23/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/26/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/29/2016: Minute Order

[PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTION REQUESTED

10/21/2016: [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTION REQUESTED

Minute Order

10/25/2016: Minute Order

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP 877.6(A)(2)

10/26/2016: ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP 877.6(A)(2)

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B281143.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • RESPONDENT S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) ________

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record (DESIGNATION FILED BY NICHELLE D. JONES BEHALF OF DAVID S. LINDLEY ); Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S10; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
405 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • PLAINTIFF DAVID S. LINDLEY'S DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Declaration (OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • PLAINTIFF MAUREEN K. SENNHAUSER'S DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by DAVID S. LINDLEY (Plaintiff); DAVID W. LINDLEY (Plaintiff); MAUREEN K. SENNHAUSER (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR 1) WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less