This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 20:46:11 (UTC).

DAVID S. KARTON, ET AL., VS ARI DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 DAVID S KARTON, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARI DESIGN CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN and NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5392

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

KARTON CHERLY

KARTON DAVID S.

KARTON CHERYL

Defendants and Respondents

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

TOLEDANO SHAHAR

GUTTMAN YONI

ARI DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

MESSIKA ILAN

GUTTMAN JONATHAN

Not Classified By Court

HON. JAMES A. STEELE (RET.)

RET. HON. JAMES A. STEELE

Other

KARTON DAVID S. ESQ.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

ABRAMSON JOE R.

KARTON DAVID SHIRE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BEITCHMAN DAVID P.

HAUSMAN & SOSA

BEITCHMAN DAVID PRISYON

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

8/30/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

Notice of Ruling

11/9/2018: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY TO ARI'S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL ARGUMENTS TO MOTION FOR FEES

3/12/2019: Reply - REPLY TO ARI'S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL ARGUMENTS TO MOTION FOR FEES

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/5/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

5/17/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Tax C...)

10/24/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Defendants' Motion to Strike and/or Tax C...)

Complaint

2/11/2016: Complaint

Minute Order

8/15/2018: Minute Order

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

9/5/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/14/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

12/21/2018: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

12/26/2018: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Exhibit List

2/25/2019: Exhibit List

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

3/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE AND REQUEST THAT ORAP OF WESCO FOR 4/12/19 BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

4/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE AND REQUEST THAT ORAP OF WESCO FOR 4/12/19 BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Judgment -

8/15/2018: Judgment -

Ex Parte Application - For Order Modifying the Judgment

8/29/2018: Ex Parte Application - For Order Modifying the Judgment

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -

7/26/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B298003, NOA 5/17/19;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B294230 & B294641); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Cheryl Karton (Appellant); David S. Karton (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U1"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (U1); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U1"); Filed by Cheryl Karton (Appellant); David S. Karton (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees Heard March 25, 2019 and Filed May 10, 2019)); Filed by David S. Karton (Plaintiff); Cheryl Karton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (Order After Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Heard March 25, 2019); Filed by David S. Karton (Plaintiff); Cheryl Karton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
371 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by David S. Karton (Plaintiff); Cheryl Karton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David S. Karton (Plaintiff); Cheryl Karton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARI DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON JOE R