This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:04:11 (UTC).

DAVID MACIAS VS OLGA GAINULLINA

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 DAVID MACIAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OLGA GAINULLINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1257

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACIAS DAVID

Respondent

GAINULLINA OLGA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Macias, David - Granted on 2016-12-16 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Macias, David ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Macias, David ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Macias, David ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less