This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 00:06:46 (UTC).

DAVID JOSEPH PARZIALE VS FELIPE GUEVARA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 DAVID JOSEPH PARZIALE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FELIPE GUEVARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5888

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARZIALE DAVID JOSEPH

Defendants and Respondents

GUEVARA FELIPE

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

HERNANDEZ CART SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NATANIAN NAVID A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DOMINGUEZ JACQUELINE I.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/5/2017: Minute Order

SUMMONS

4/15/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

4/15/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/19/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/19/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/19/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE

3/30/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE

Minute Order

9/29/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Hernandez Cart Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Joseph Parziale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Felipe Guevara (Defendant); Hernandez Cart Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Hernandez Cart Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Felipe Guevara (Defendant); Hernandez Cart Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by David Joseph Parziale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDEZ CART SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATANIAN NAVID A. ESQ.