This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2016 at 04:42:24 (UTC).

DAVID ANDREWS VS LILO BEUZIERON

Case Summary

On 10/17/2012 DAVID ANDREWS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LILO BEUZIERON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9483

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREWS DAVID

Defendant

BEUZIERON LILO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEMAN FREEMAN & SMILEY

Defendant Attorney

OLESK JAAK LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Affidavit - misc (OF IDENTITY & ORDER (No means to return) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Affidavit - misc (of identity and order - Lilo Ben Zicron ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Notice (and acknowledgment of receipt ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Stipulated Judgment ((Copy returned via atty service) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Stipulation (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Request (FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS OF DAVID ANDREWS AND STEVEN E. YOUNG (WITH EXHIBITS) IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal (AND PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SECTION 664.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • Jury Fee Deposit by Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • Notice (of errata ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Notice (of OSC re trial court delay reduction ) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less