This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 15:26:07 (UTC).

DAVE DEAN VS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/06/2014 DAVE DEAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4865

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAN DAVE

Defendants

HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC

IVAR INVESTMENTS LLC

KUSHNER DONALD

NIGHTLIFE VENTURES LLC

PROJECT LOS ANGELES LLC

SAMAHA ELIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTIE GAUMER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

5/6/2014: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

5/6/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, WAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMARA, DONALD KUSHNER AND ETC

7/1/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, WAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMARA, DONALD KUSHNER AND ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/1/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF LIEN

8/7/2014: NOTICE OF LIEN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/4/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/4/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/5/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

9/8/2014: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF DAVE DEAN?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

11/26/2014: PLAINTIFF DAVE DEAN?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF? S COMPLAINT

12/4/2014: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF? S COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

12/11/2014: Minute Order -

RULING

12/11/2014: RULING

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSIINER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, LLC, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/16/2014: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSIINER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, LLC, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

FL RST ANI ENDED CONI PLA INT FOR: 1) BREACH OF 0R.AL CONTRACT; 2) FRAUD; 3) NELIGENT MISREPRESENFAT?ION; AND 4) ACCT) UNT1N

1/2/2015: FL RST ANI ENDED CONI PLA INT FOR: 1) BREACH OF 0R.AL CONTRACT; 2) FRAUD; 3) NELIGENT MISREPRESENFAT?ION; AND 4) ACCT) UNT1N

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSHNER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, EEC, TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AM

2/2/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSHNER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, EEC, TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AM

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSHNER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, LLC, TO P

2/2/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, IVAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMAHA, DONALD KUSHNER AND NIGHTLIFE VENTURES, LLC, TO P

Minute Order -

2/20/2015: Minute Order -

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dave Dean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 54; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Lien Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Docket1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC, WAR INVESTMENTS, LLC, PROJECT LOS ANGELES, LLC, ELIE SAMARA, DONALD KUSHNER AND ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dave Dean (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less