This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 14:46:55 (UTC).

DARYL PARKER VS WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2016 DARYL PARKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1819

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PARKER DARYL

Defendants and Respondents

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

WHITTIER EAST LLC

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTCARE CENTER

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HEIMAN NICHOLAS ESQ.

HEIMAN NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

ENSIGN SERVICES INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/27/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/27/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8/25/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/18/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

5/27/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

5/27/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/13/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

5/22/2018: ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/27/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

1/30/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS HEIMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/26/2018: DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS HEIMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Ensign Whittier East, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Daryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant