This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 03:14:10 (UTC).

DARREN JONES VS. ARRI AND E FILMS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 DARREN JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ARRI AND E FILMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON and PAUL GUTMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7844

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

PAUL GUTMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES DARREN

Defendants

EFILM DIGITAL LABORATORIES LLC.

ARRI

DOES 1 TO 30

Cross Defendants

BETRIEBS KG

ARNOLD & EICHTER CINE GMBH & CO.

ROES 1 TO 10

KG BETRIEBS

Not Classified By Court

"E" FILMS

TELL FRANKLIN D.

FILMS "E"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREXLER DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

OWENS JOSEPH C

ZYGELMAN CORINE

Other Attorneys

FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2012
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed priord) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Docketin Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed priord

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by ARNOLD & EICHTER CINE GMBH & CO. (Cross-Defendant); BETRIEBS KG (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketNotice-Entry-Dismissal; Filed by Attorney-Cross Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Dismissal-Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NWB, FRANK J. JOHNSON, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (C/F 10-07-11&OSC RE: SANCS. AGAINST PLNT. FTA@ CMC) - Dismissal-Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (W/O PREJUDICE, AS TO X-COMPL. OF "E-FILM DIGITAL LABORATORIES" ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by EFILM DIGITAL LABORATORIES, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by DARREN JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (AS TO COMPLAINT OF DARREN JONES ONLY WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by DARREN JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed (on first amended complaint ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by DARREN JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketComplaint-Amended (1st); Filed by DARREN JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketComplaint-Amended (1st); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DARREN JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRI INC is a litigant