This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:19:28 (UTC).

DARNELL HEBRON ET AL VS BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 DARNELL HEBRON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8296

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

HEBRON DIONNE

HEBRON DARNELL

SHORT BRENDA

VELASCO ASHLEY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES I THROUGH XX

BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Minor

HEBRON LEIONNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

RIBEIRO DAVID D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/19/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT TRIAL BRIEF

1/19/2018: PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT TRIAL BRIEF

Minute Order

1/26/2018: Minute Order

JUDGEMENT AFTER DEFAULT TRIAL

1/26/2018: JUDGEMENT AFTER DEFAULT TRIAL

STATENENT OF DAMAGES

10/24/2016: STATENENT OF DAMAGES

Unknown

10/24/2016: Unknown

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

10/24/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE CAUSING PERSONAL INJURY, BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY, NEGLIGENT MAINTENANCE OF PREMISES, VIOLATION OF STATUTORY DUTY

10/24/2016: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE CAUSING PERSONAL INJURY, BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY, NEGLIGENT MAINTENANCE OF PREMISES, VIOLATION OF STATUTORY DUTY

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

10/31/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/15/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

3/2/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/6/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/17/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC REGARDING JUDGMENT

6/22/2017: DECLARATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC REGARDING JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

11/8/2017: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • JUDGEMENT AFTER DEFAULT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 74; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Brief ; Filed by Darnell Hebron (Plaintiff); Brenda Short (Plaintiff); Ashley Velasco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS' DEFAULT TRIAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 74; Default Prove Up Hearing (Civil Default Prove Up Hearing; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE CAUSING PERSONAL INJURY, BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY, NEGLIGENT MAINTENANCE OF PREMISES, VIOLATION OF STATUTORY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Darnell Hebron (Plaintiff); Brenda Short (Plaintiff); Ashley Velasco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • STATENENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC638296    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 74

BC638296 DARNELL HEBRON ET AL VS BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant’s Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Default Judgment

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion to set aside entry of default and default judgment is GRANTED. Defendant may file an answer within 10 days. The request to quash service of the summons and complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to a properly noticed motion. The request for an order accepting the Proposed Answer is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to defendant filing an answer once default and default judgment have been vacated.

Defendant’s request for judicial notice is DENIED. The court does, however, take judicial notice of the contents of the court file in this matter.