This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 14:17:07 (UTC).

DARIUSH PASHAKHAN VS DAVID MOSHE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 DARIUSH PASHAKHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAVID MOSHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4292

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PASHAKHAN DARISH

Defendants and Respondents

MOSHE DAVID

MOSHE ETTY

ARNALDES DAVID

DOES 1 50

DOES 1 - 50

MOSHE ORR DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FOX JAMES E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM MARK G. ESQ.

HALL ANN C. ESQ.

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY

2/11/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

5/30/2017: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

Minute Order

6/13/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY ORR MOSHE (DOE 1)

5/11/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY ORR MOSHE (DOE 1)

Notice of Ruling

1/5/2017: Notice of Ruling

DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' REPLY TO MOSHE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTEST DEFENDANTS DAVID MOSHE, ETTY MOSHE AND ORR MOSHE'S APPLICATION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/25/2017: DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' REPLY TO MOSHE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTEST DEFENDANTS DAVID MOSHE, ETTY MOSHE AND ORR MOSHE'S APPLICATION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

9/20/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

5/30/2017: DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9/30/2016: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE; ORDER

1/13/2017: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE; ORDER

DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTEST DEFENDANTS DAVID MOSHE, ETTY MOSHE AND ETC

6/21/2017: DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTEST DEFENDANTS DAVID MOSHE, ETTY MOSHE AND ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/8/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOSHE'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

5/30/2017: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ARNALDES' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOSHE'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS.

DECLARATION OF JAMESE. FOX IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/18/2017: DECLARATION OF JAMESE. FOX IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/28/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/9/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by David Arnaldes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice; Filed by David Moshe (Defendant); Etty Moshe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Darish Pashakhan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Darish Pashakhan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Darish Pashakhan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Darish Pashakhan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less