This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 13:54:37 (UTC).

DANNY HUERTA VS NICOLAS NIGHT CLUB ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2009 DANNY HUERTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NICOLAS NIGHT CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6933

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HUERTA DANNY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

KAHROBAIE MASOUD ISAAC

NICOLA'S NIGHT CLUB

NICOLA'S TOPLESS ENTERTAINMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHEGINI MITRA ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

YOUNGERMAN STEPHEN ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Court Order - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (W/O PREJUDICE AND AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice cross-complaint filed by Nicola's Night Club on 9-21-2009 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketNotice (of order to show cause re dismissal ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Court Order - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case) (with prejudice cross-complaint filed by Masoud Issac Kahrobaie on 9-21-2009 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (of entire case ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC. DBA NICOLA'S GENTLEMEN'S CLUB is a litigant