This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 13:07:44 (UTC).

DANIEL UMBAY VS. JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 DANIEL UMBAY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5583

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UMBAY DANIEL AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

JACOBS TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC. A CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY A. DOUGLAS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

EVAN R. MOSES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof of Service (OF DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice of Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (PARTY SERVED: CARMINE J. PEARL, II ESQ.-OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK, & STEWAR, P.C. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Notice (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice-Peremptory Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Telecommunications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSES EVAN REED