This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:29:51 (UTC).

DANIEL MARTINEZ VS JORGE ALEJANDRO ABARCA ROSAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 DANIEL MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE ALEJANDRO ABARCA ROSAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3555

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ DANIEL

Defendants and Respondents

RATTIGAN CONSTRUCTION INC.

RATTIGAN GORDON

ROSAS JORGE ALEJANDRO ABARCA

DOES 1 TO 100

GEARY PACIFIC INC.

STEVENS RICHARD ALLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN AND ROWLEY LLP

SACHS CHELSEE MICHELLE

Defendant Attorneys

HOLMBERG BRAIN D. ESQ.

HYDE SHERAL ANN

RANDOLPH JANE E. ESQ.

ROCKWELL EMILY EUGENIA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

2/22/2018: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES: DECLARATION OF JASON C. EISENHERG IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER

5/25/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES: DECLARATION OF JASON C. EISENHERG IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/25/2018: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE. AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SFL ONE. TO DEFENDANT GORDON RATTIGAN PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2030.300 ET

8/10/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE. AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SFL ONE. TO DEFENDANT GORDON RATTIGAN PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2030.300 ET

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE TO DEFENDANT RATTIGAN CONSTRUCTION INC. PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2031.310 ET SEQ.; ETC

8/10/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE TO DEFENDANT RATTIGAN CONSTRUCTION INC. PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2031.310 ET SEQ.; ETC

SEPARATE STATEIIENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GORDON RATTIGAN'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, AND PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

8/10/2018: SEPARATE STATEIIENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GORDON RATTIGAN'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, AND PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, TO DEFENDANT RATTIGAN CONSTRUCTION INC. PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2

8/10/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, TO DEFENDANT RATTIGAN CONSTRUCTION INC. PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2

Order

10/12/2018: Order

Minute Order

10/12/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/12/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice

10/16/2018: Notice

Notice of Ruling

10/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Other -

10/22/2018: Other -

Order

10/23/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

5/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD ALLAN STEVENS AND GEARY PACIFIC, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; DECLARATION OF JANE E. RANDOLPH

12/16/2016: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD ALLAN STEVENS AND GEARY PACIFIC, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; DECLARATION OF JANE E. RANDOLPH

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and related discovery deadlines pursuant to stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION); Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and related...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Daniel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC633555    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

On September 12, 2016, Plaintiff Daniel Martinez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Jorge Alejandro Abarca Rosas (“Rosas”), Gordon Rattigan (“Rattigan”) and Rattigan Construction Inc. (“RC”) (collectively, “Defendants”) for negligence arising out of a September 24, 2015 vehicle collision.

On May 2, 2018, Plaintiff propounded supplemental interrogatories and supplement requests for production on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan. On May 11, 2018, Plaintiff propounded second sets of special interrogatories on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan. On May 11, 2018, Plaintiff propounded second sets of requests for production on RC, Rosas and Rattigan. On March 19, 2019, Plaintiff propounded second supplementary interrogatories on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan, and second supplemental requests for production on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan. On April 8, 2019, Plaintiff propounded third sets of requests for production on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan. On May 24, 2019, Plaintiff propounded third supplemental interrogatories on RC, Rosas and Rattigan, and third supplemental requests for production on RC, Rosas, and Rattigan. Defendants did not to respond to any of the discovery. Plaintiff moves to compel responses to the discovery served on May 11, 2018, March 19, 2019, April 8, 2019, and May 24, 2019. Plaintiff does not move to compel responses to the discovery served on May 2, 2018.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).) Unlike a motion to compel further responses, a motion to compel responses is not subject to a 45-day time limit and the propounding party has no meet and confer obligations. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at p. 404.)

Defendants filed no opposition to these Motions and failed to serve responses to Plaintiff’s requests for discovery. However, Plaintiff was required to bring separate motions for each set of discovery response that is the subject of a motion to compel. Plaintiff filed only six motions and paid only six filing fees, instead of filing 21 motions and paying 21 filing fees. Accordingly, the motions to compel Defendants’ responses are GRANTED subject to Plaintiff’s payment of the additional 15 filing fees. Subject to proof of payment of the additional filing fees, the Court orders each Defendant within ten days of the date of this order to produce documents and serve verified responses without objection to: (1) Plaintiff’s second set of special interrogatories propounded on May 11, 2018, (2) Plaintiff’s second set of requests for production propounded on May 11, 2018, (3) Plaintiff’s second supplementary interrogatory propounded on March 19, 2019, (4) Plaintiff’s second supplementary request for production propounded on March 19, 2019, (5) Plaintiff’s third set of requests for production propounded on April 8, 2019, (6) Plaintiff’s third supplemental interrogatory propounded on May 24, 2019, and (7) Plaintiff’s third supplemental request for production propounded on May 24, 2019.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.